US HR323 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Pending: House Oversight And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Pending: House Oversight And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes the historical significance to the nation, and supports the continued celebration, of Juneteenth Independence Day (June 19, 1865, the day Union soldiers arrived in Galveston, Texas, with news that the Civil War had ended and that the enslaved African Americans were free). Declares the sense of the House of Representatives that: (1) history should be regarded as a means for understanding the past and solving the challenges of the future, and (2) the celebration of the end of slavery is an important and enriching part of the history and heritage of the United States.
Title
Observing the historical significance of Juneteenth Independence Day.
Sponsors
Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
Same As/Similar To
SR211 (Same As) 2011-06-20 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S3937)
SR496 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4308-4310; text as passed Senate: CR S4308; text of measure as introduced: CR S4304)
SR496 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4308-4310; text as passed Senate: CR S4308; text of measure as introduced: CR S4304)
Subjects
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Commemorative events and holidays
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history
Commemorative events and holidays
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-resolution/323/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hres323/BILLS-112hres323ih.pdf |