US SR211 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-5-1)
Status: Introduced on June 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-20 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S3937)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-20 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S3937)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes the historical significance to the nation, and supports the continued celebration, of Juneteenth Independence Day (June 19, 1865, the day Union soldiers arrived in Galveston, Texas, with news that the Civil War had ended and that the enslaved African Americans were free). Declares the sense of the Senate that: (1) history should be regarded as a means for understanding the past and solving the challenges of the future, and (2) the celebration of the end of slavery is an important and enriching part of the history and heritage of the United States.
Title
A resolution observing the historical significance of Juneteenth Independence Day.
Sponsors
Sen. Carl Levin [D-MI] | Sen. Daniel Akaka [D-HI] | Sen. Mark Begich [D-AK] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] |
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Thad Cochran [R-MS] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] |
Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Kay Hagan [D-NC] | Sen. Tom Harkin [D-IA] | Sen. Kay Hutchison [R-TX] |
Sen. John Kerry [D-MA] | Sen. Mary Landrieu [D-LA] | Sen. Frank Lautenberg [D-NJ] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] |
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Barbara Mikulski [D-MD] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] |
Sen. Mark Pryor [D-AR] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] |
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Mark Udall [D-CO] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] |
Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-20 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S3937) |
2011-06-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3937) |
2011-06-16 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3898) |
Same As/Similar To
HR323 (Same As) 2011-06-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
SR496 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4308-4310; text as passed Senate: CR S4308; text of measure as introduced: CR S4304)
SR496 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4308-4310; text as passed Senate: CR S4308; text of measure as introduced: CR S4304)
Subjects
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Commemorative events and holidays
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history
Commemorative events and holidays
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history