US HR313 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 1 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-05 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-05 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses support for the goals and ideals of National Public Works Week. Recognizes the important contributions that public works professionals make every day to improve public infrastructure and the communities they serve.
Title
Supporting the goals and ideals of National Public Works Week, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Rep. Corrine Brown [D-FL] | Rep. Jerry Costello [D-IL] | Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD] |
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] | Rep. John Duncan [R-TN] | Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] |
Rep. Frank LoBiondo [R-NJ] | Rep. John Mica [R-FL] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. James Oberstar [D-MN] |
Rep. Thomas Petri [R-WI] | Rep. Bill Shuster [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-05 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-05-05 | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5125) | |
2009-05-05 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 313. | |
2009-05-05 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5125-5127) | |
2009-05-05 | Ms. Brown, Corrine moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. | |
2009-04-21 | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 43. | |
2009-04-21 | Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 111-80. | |
2009-04-02 | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. | |
2009-04-02 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2009-04-02 | Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials Discharged. | |
2009-04-02 | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged. | |
2009-04-02 | Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Discharged. | |
2009-04-02 | Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation Discharged. | |
2009-04-02 | Subcommittee on Aviation Discharged. | |
2009-04-02 | Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Discharged. | |
2009-04-02 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials. | |
2009-04-02 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. | |
2009-04-02 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. | |
2009-04-02 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation. | |
2009-04-02 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation. | |
2009-04-02 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. | |
2009-04-01 | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. | |
2009-04-01 | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E840) |
Same As/Similar To
HR1125 (Related) 2010-03-25 - On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 249 - 172 (Roll no. 191).
SR145 (Related) 2009-05-12 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5395; text as passed Senate: CR S5395; text of measure as introduced: CR S5378)
SR145 (Related) 2009-05-12 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5395; text as passed Senate: CR S5395; text of measure as introduced: CR S5378)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Infrastructure development
Transportation and public works
Congressional tributes
Infrastructure development
Transportation and public works