US HR26 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

This resolution impeaches President Donald John Trump for high crimes and misdemeanors. Specifically, the resolution sets forth two articles of impeachment stating that President Trump has abused the powers of the presidency. The first article states that, using the powers of his office, President Trump sought to threaten, intimidate, and solicit the Secretary of State of Georgia to acquiesce to his demand to find enough votes to make him the winner of Georgia's presidential election, even though the votes in Georgia had already been counted three times in favor of his opponent. The article further states that, by doing so, President Trump actively undermined public faith and confidence in the integrity of American elections, subverted the rule of law, and placed his personal interests above the national interest. The second article states that President Trump has endeavored to undermine foundations of U.S. democracy, indicating an intention to make himself an authoritarian ruler who is unaccountable to the U.S. people. The article specifies the following actions by President Trump: refusing to acknowledge, and opposing efforts to protect against, Russian interference in U.S. affairs; expressing willingness to accept foreign assistance to win reelection; refusing to accept the results of the election; undermining the ability of American citizens to exercise their rights as voters; falsely alleging widespread voting fraud while producing no evidence; inciting his supporters to believe falsely that the election had been stolen from him; and failing to take action to protect federal officers, personnel, property, and institutions on January 6, 2021, when the Capitol was besieged by his supporters. Both articles state that, by such conduct, President Trump warrants impeachment and trial, removal from office, and disqualification to hold U.S. office.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Impeaching Donald John Trump, President of the United States, for high crimes and misdemeanors.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-04HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
2021-01-13HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H159-160, H184-185)
2021-01-11HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects

Assault and harassment offenses
Civil actions and liability
Civil disturbances
Congress
Congressional officers and employees
Congressional operations and organization
Congressional oversight
Congressional-executive branch relations
Constitution and constitutional amendments
Crimes against property
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Europe
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Georgia
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Law enforcement officers
Members of Congress
Postal service
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Protection of officials
Protest and dissent
Rule of law and government transparency
Russia
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
State and local government operations
Subversive activities
Terrorism
U.S. Capitol
U.S. Postal Service
Violent crime

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback