US HR175 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution supports the designation of National Fishing and Boating Week and recognizes that the recreational boating community and the boating industry should be commended for their numerous contributions to the economy, the well-being of citizens, and responsible environmental stewardship of water resources.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of the week of June 1, 2019, through June 9, 2019, as National Fishing and Boating Week.
Sponsors
Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL] | Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation. |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR174 (Related) 2019-06-05 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 04/30/2019 S2523)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Hunting and fishing
Marine and inland water transportation
Outdoor recreation
Transportation and public works
Hunting and fishing
Marine and inland water transportation
Outdoor recreation
Transportation and public works
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/175/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres175/BILLS-116hres175ih.pdf |