US HR1508 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 3648) to amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to eliminate the per-country numerical limitation for employment-based immigrants, to increase the per-country numerical limitation for family-sponsored immigrants, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 7946) to provide benefits for noncitizen members of the Armed Forces, and for other purposes; and for other purposes.
Title
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 3648) to amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to eliminate the per-country numerical limitation for employment-based immigrants, to increase the per-country numerical limitation for family-sponsored immigrants, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 7946) to provide benefits for noncitizen members of the Armed Forces, and for other purposes; and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] |
Roll Calls
2022-12-06 - House - Passage of a Measure (Y: 215 N: 201 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-06 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-12-06 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 215 - 201 (Roll no. 501). (text: CR H8759-8760) |
2022-12-06 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8762-8763) |
2022-12-06 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H. Res. 1508, the Chair put the question on agreeing to the resolution and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mrs. Fischbach demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair announced that further proceedings on agreeing to the resolution would be postponed. |
2022-12-06 | House | The previous question was ordered without objection. |
2022-12-06 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 1508. |
2022-12-06 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H8759-8762) |
2022-12-06 | House | The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 3648, under a structured rule and H.R. 7946, under a structured rule. The resolution waives the requirement of clause 6(a) of rule XIII for a two-thirds vote to consider a report from the Committee on Rules on the same day it is presented to the House with respect to any resolution reported through the remainder of the 117th Congress. |
2022-12-06 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 155. |
2022-12-06 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 117-590, by Mr. McGovern. |
2022-12-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3648 (Related) 2022-12-14 - POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - Pursuant to clause 1(c) of rule XIX, further proceedings on H.R. 3648 were postponed.
HB8844 (Related) 2022-12-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
SB198 (Related) 2022-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 117-247.
SB1687 (Related) 2022-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 117-319.
HB7946 (Related) 2022-12-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB8844 (Related) 2022-12-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
SB198 (Related) 2022-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 117-247.
SB1687 (Related) 2022-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 117-319.
HB7946 (Related) 2022-12-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.