US HB3648 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 76-8)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-14 - POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - Pursuant to clause 1(c) of rule XIX, further proceedings on H.R. 3648 were postponed.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-14 - POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - Pursuant to clause 1(c) of rule XIX, further proceedings on H.R. 3648 were postponed.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to eliminate the per-country numerical limitation for employment-based immigrants, to increase the per-country numerical limitation for family-sponsored immigrants, and for other purposes.
Title
EAGLE Act of 2022 Equal Access to Green cards for Legal Employment Act of 2022
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-14 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - Pursuant to clause 1(c) of rule XIX, further proceedings on H.R. 3648 were postponed. |
2022-12-14 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9821) |
2022-12-13 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 3648, the Chair put the question on adoption of the motion to recommit and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Bishop (NC) demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced. |
2022-12-13 | House | The previous question on the motion to recommit was ordered pursuant to clause 2(b) of rule XIX. |
2022-12-13 | House | Mr. Bishop (NC) moved to recommit to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2022-12-13 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2022-12-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 3648. |
2022-12-13 | House | The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 3648, under a structured rule and H.R. 7946, under a structured rule. The resolution waives the requirement of clause 6(a) of rule XIII for a two-thirds vote to consider a report from the Committee on Rules on the same day it is presented to the House with respect to any resolution reported through the remainder of the 117th Congress. |
2022-12-13 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1508. (consideration: CR H9708-9717; text: CR H9708-9711) |
2022-12-06 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1508 Reported to House. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 3648, under a structured rule and H.R. 7946, under a structured rule. The resolution waives the requirement of clause 6(a) of rule XIII for a two-thirds vote to consider a report from the Committee on Rules on the same day it is presented to the House with respect to any resolution reported through the remainder of the 117th Congress. |
2022-06-07 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 267. |
2022-06-07 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 117-353. |
2022-04-06 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 14. |
2022-04-06 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-06-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2021-06-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4567 (Related) 2022-07-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HR1508 (Related) 2022-12-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1508 (Related) 2022-12-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.