US HR144 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 90-11)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of the week of February 22 through February 26, 2021, as "Public Schools Week".
Title
Expressing support for the designation of the week of February 22 through February 26, 2021, as "Public Schools Week".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2021-02-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR77 (Related) 2021-02-25 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S905; text: CR S901)
HR939 (Same As) 2022-02-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR520 (Related) 2022-02-17 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S800; text: CR S792)
HR939 (Same As) 2022-02-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR520 (Related) 2022-02-17 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S800; text: CR S792)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/144/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres144/BILLS-117hres144ih.pdf |