US SR77 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-4-3)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S905; text: CR S901)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S905; text: CR S901)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating the week of February 22 through February 26, 2021, as "Public Schools Week".
Title
A resolution designating the week of February 22 through February 26, 2021, as "Public Schools Week".
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] |
Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] |
Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] |
Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] |
Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S905; text: CR S901) |
Same As/Similar To
HR144 (Related) 2021-02-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HR939 (Related) 2022-02-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR520 (Related) 2022-02-17 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S800; text: CR S792)
HR939 (Related) 2022-02-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR520 (Related) 2022-02-17 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S800; text: CR S792)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-resolution/77/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/sres77/BILLS-117sres77ats.pdf |