US HR1287 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-22 - On motion to refer Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 402 - 0, 17 Present (Roll no. 218). (consideration: CR H2816)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-22 - On motion to refer Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 402 - 0, 17 Present (Roll no. 218). (consideration: CR H2816)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Committee on Standards of Official Conduct to report to the House of Representatives, with respect to the activities addressed in its report of February 26, 2010 (regarding possible connections between PMA Group campaign contributions and specific earmarks), on: (1) how many witnesses were interviewed; (2) how many, if any, subpoenas were issued in the course of their investigation; and (3) what documents were reviewed and their availability for public review.
Title
Raising a question of the privileges of the House.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Flake [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-22 | On motion to refer Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 402 - 0, 17 Present (Roll no. 218). (consideration: CR H2816) | |
2010-04-22 | The previous question on the motion to refer was ordered without objection. (consideration: CR H2816) | |
2010-04-22 | Mr. Hastings (FL) moved to refer to Standards of Official Conduct. (consideration: CR H2815) | |
2010-04-22 | On ordering the previous question Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 187 - 218, 16 Present (Roll no. 217). (consideration: CR H2815-2816) | |
2010-04-22 | QUESTION OF THE PRIVILEGES OF THE HOUSE - Mr. Flake rose to a question of the privileges of the House and offered a previously noticed privileged resolution. The Chair announced that the resolution qualified and directed the Clerk to report the resolution to the House. | |
2010-04-22 | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H2815-2816; text of measure as introduced: CR H2815) | |
2010-04-22 | Referred to the House Committee on Standards of Official Conduct. |
Same As/Similar To
HR1193 (Same As) 2010-03-18 - On motion to refer Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 397 - 0, 12 Present ) (Roll No. 131).
HR1255 (Same As) 2010-04-15 - On motion to refer the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 385 - 0, 18 Present (Roll no. 206). (text: CR H2609-2610)
HR1255 (Same As) 2010-04-15 - On motion to refer the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 385 - 0, 18 Present (Roll no. 206). (text: CR H2609-2610)
Subjects
Appropriations
Congressional oversight
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Evidence and witnesses
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government investigations
House of Representatives
Public participation and lobbying
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-resolution/1287/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hres1287/BILLS-111hres1287rth.pdf |