US HR1181 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Waiving a requirement of clause 6(a) of rule XIII with respect to consideration of certain resolutions reported from the Committee on Rules, and providing for consideration of motions to suspend the rules.
Title
Waiving a requirement of clause 6(a) of rule XIII with respect to consideration of certain resolutions reported from the Committee on Rules, and providing for consideration of motions to suspend the rules.
Sponsors
Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-20 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 447 (Y: 350 N: 30 NV: 52 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-12-20 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 350 - 30 (Roll no. 447). (text: CR H10343) |
2018-12-20 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10345-10346) |
2018-12-20 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.Res. 1181, the Chair put the question on agreeing to the resolution and by voice vote, announced that the ayes prevailed. Mr. McGovern demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until later in the legislative day. |
2018-12-20 | House | The previous question was ordered without objection. |
2018-12-20 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 1181. |
2018-12-20 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H10343-10344) |
2018-12-19 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 198. |
2018-12-19 | House | Rule waives clause 6(a) of rule XIII against any resolution reported from the Rules Committee thorugh the legislative day of December 24, 2018. The rule also provices that it shall be in order at any time through the calendar day of December 23, 2018, for the Speaker to entertain motions that the House suspend the rules. |
2018-12-19 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 115-1085, by Mr. Sessions. |