US HR1104 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Pending: House Foreign Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Pending: House Foreign Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing the 203d anniversary of the War of Greek Independence.
Title
Recognizing the 203d anniversary of the War of Greek Independence.
Sponsors
Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD] | Rep. Nicole Malliotakis [R-NY] |
Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Seth Magaziner [D-RI] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] |
Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Gabe Amo [D-RI] | Rep. Nick LaLota [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2024-03-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR251 (Related) 2023-03-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
SR119 (Related) 2023-05-04 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1543; text: 3/23/2023 CR S935-936)
SR606 (Related) 2024-03-21 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SR119 (Related) 2023-05-04 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1543; text: 3/23/2023 CR S935-936)
SR606 (Related) 2024-03-21 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-resolution/1104/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hres1104/BILLS-118hres1104ih.pdf |