US HR1104 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses support for the mission and goals of the 2010 National Crime Victims' Rights Week to increase public awareness of the impact on victims and survivors of crime and the constitutional and statutory rights and needs of such victims and survivors. Recognizes that fairness, dignity, and respect comprise the very foundation of how victims and survivors of crime should be treated.
Title
Supporting the mission and goals of 2010 National Crime Victims' Rights Week to increase public awareness of the rights, needs, and concerns of victims and survivors of crime in the United States, no matter their country of origin or their creed, and to commemorate the National Crime Victims' Rights Week theme of "Crime Victims' Rights: Fairness. Dignity. Respect.".
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Baca [D-CA] | Rep. Dennis Cardoza [D-CA] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] |
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Tim Holden [D-PA] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] |
Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] | Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Thaddeus McCotter [R-MI] |
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Walter Minnick [D-ID] | Rep. Dennis Moore [D-KS] | Rep. James Moran [D-VA] |
Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Pedro Pierluisi [N-PR] | Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] | Rep. David Reichert [R-WA] |
Rep. Edward Royce [R-CA] | Rep. Aaron Schock [R-IL] | Rep. Edolphus Towns [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-04-21 | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 417 - 0 (Roll no. 215). (text: CR 4/20/2010 H2664) | |
2010-04-21 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2765-2766) | |
2010-04-20 | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. | |
2010-04-20 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 1104. | |
2010-04-20 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2664-2668) | |
2010-04-20 | Mr. Cohen moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. | |
2010-02-24 | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HR109 (Related) 2009-04-29 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SR93 (Related) 2009-04-30 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
SR486 (Related) 2010-04-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2393-2394; text as passed Senate: CR S2394; text of measure as introduced: CR S2390)
SR93 (Related) 2009-04-30 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
SR486 (Related) 2010-04-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2393-2394; text as passed Senate: CR S2394; text of measure as introduced: CR S2390)