US HR1066 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of April 2022 as "Second Chance Month".
Title
Expressing support for the designation of April 2022 as "Second Chance Month".
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2022-04-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2022-04-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR350 (Same As) 2021-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SR146 (Related) 2021-04-29 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S1837-1838)
SR605 (Related) 2022-05-17 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2535; text: 4/28/2022 CR S2224)
SR146 (Related) 2021-04-29 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S1837-1838)
SR605 (Related) 2022-05-17 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2535; text: 4/28/2022 CR S2224)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/1066/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres1066/BILLS-117hres1066ih.pdf |