US SR146 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-29 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S1837-1838)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-29 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S1837-1838)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating April 2021 as "Second Chance Month".
Title
A resolution designating April 2021 as "Second Chance Month".
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S1837-1838) |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2385-2386) |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HR350 (Related) 2021-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HR1066 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SR605 (Related) 2022-05-17 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2535; text: 4/28/2022 CR S2224)
HR1066 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SR605 (Related) 2022-05-17 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2535; text: 4/28/2022 CR S2224)