US HR1046 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of the weeks of April 10, 2022, through April 23, 2022, as "National Young Audiences Arts for Learning Weeks".
Title
Expressing support for the designation of the weeks of April 10, 2022, through April 23, 2022, as "National Young Audiences Arts for Learning Weeks".
Sponsors
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
2022-04-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR269 (Same As) 2021-03-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/1046/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres1046/BILLS-117hres1046ih.pdf |