US HR1030 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-6)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of the week of September 18 through September 24, 2022, as "Gold Star Families Remembrance Week".
Title
Expressing support for the designation of the week of September 18 through September 24, 2022, as "Gold Star Families Remembrance Week".
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Jake Ellzey [R-TX] | Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] |
Rep. Tracey Mann [R-KS] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Lance Gooden [R-TX] |
Sen. Ted Budd [R-NC] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA] |
Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA] | Rep. Maria Salazar [R-FL] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. Ben Cline [R-VA] |
Rep. Young Kim [R-CA] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA] | Rep. Marilyn Strickland [D-WA] |
Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2022-04-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2022-04-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR675 (Related) 2021-09-22 - Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SR376 (Related) 2021-09-21 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6593; text: CR S6592)
SR761 (Related) 2022-09-13 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4582; text: CR S4581)
SR376 (Related) 2021-09-21 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6593; text: CR S6592)
SR761 (Related) 2022-09-13 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4582; text: CR S4581)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/1030/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres1030/BILLS-117hres1030ih.pdf |