US HJR85 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Pending: House Foreign Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Pending: House Foreign Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
States that Congress does not favor the proposed agreement for cooperation between the United States and the Russian Federation pursuant to the Atomic Energy Act of 1954 transmitted to the Congress by the President on May 10, 2010.
Title
Expressing the disfavor of the Congress regarding the proposed agreement for cooperation between the United States and the Russian Federation pursuant to the Atomic Energy Act of 1954.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HJR91 (Related) 2010-06-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
HJR92 (Related) 2010-06-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
SJR34 (Related) 2010-12-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 690.
HJR92 (Related) 2010-06-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
SJR34 (Related) 2010-12-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 690.
Subjects
Energy research
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Nuclear power
Russia
Trade agreements and negotiations
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Nuclear power
Russia
Trade agreements and negotiations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-joint-resolution/85/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hjres85/BILLS-111hjres85ih.pdf |