US HJR67 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 170-0)
Status: Introduced on December 9 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-02-28 - Motion to Discharge Committee filed by Mr. Duncan. Petition No: 117-10. (Discharge petition text with signatures.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

This joint resolution nullifies the rule titled Medicare and Medicaid Programs; Omnibus COVID-19 Health Care Staff Vaccination, which was issued by the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services on November 5, 2021. The rule requires health care providers, as a condition of Medicare and Medicaid participation, to ensure that staff are fully vaccinated against COVID-19.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services relating to "Medicare and Medicaid Programs; Omnibus COVID-19 Health Care Staff Vaccination".

Sponsors

Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC]Rep. Robert Aderholt [R-AL]Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA]Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV]
Rep. Kelly Armstrong [R-ND]Rep. Jody Arrington [R-TX]Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX]Rep. James Baird [R-IN]
Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH]Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN]Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI]Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ]
Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL]Rep. Dan Bishop [R-NC]Rep. Lauren Boebert [R-CO]Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL]
Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL]Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL]Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN]Rep. Ted Budd [R-NC]
Rep. Tim Burchett [R-TN]Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX]Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA]Rep. Kat Cammack [R-FL]
Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA]Rep. David Cawthorn [R-NC]Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH]Rep. Ben Cline [R-VA]
Rep. Michael Cloud [R-TX]Rep. Andrew Clyde [R-GA]Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK]Rep. James Comer [R-KY]
Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR]Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX]Rep. John Curtis [R-UT]Rep. Warren Davidson [R-OH]
Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL]Rep. Byron Donalds [R-FL]Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL]Rep. Jake Ellzey [R-TX]
Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN]Rep. Ron Estes [R-KS]Rep. Drew Ferguson [R-GA]Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE]
Rep. Scott Franklin [R-FL]Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL]Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH]Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX]
Rep. Robert Good [R-VA]Rep. Lance Gooden [R-TX]Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO]Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA]
Rep. Marjorie Greene [R-GA]Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA]Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI]Rep. Michael Guest [R-MS]
Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY]Rep. James Hagedorn [R-MN]Rep. Andy Harris [R-MD]Rep. Diana Harshbarger [R-TN]
Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO]Rep. Kevin Hern [R-OK]Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA]Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA]
Rep. French Hill [R-AR]Rep. Ashley Hinson [R-IA]Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC]Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI]
Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA]Rep. Ronny Jackson [R-TX]Rep. Christopher Jacobs [R-NY]Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH]
Rep. Mike Johnson [R-LA]Rep. John Joyce [R-PA]Rep. Fred Keller [R-PA]Rep. Trent Kelly [R-MS]
Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA]Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL]Rep. David Kustoff [R-TN]Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL]
Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA]Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO]Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH]Rep. Jacob Laturner [R-KS]
Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ]Rep. Billy Long [R-MO]Rep. Barry Loudermilk [R-GA]Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK]
Rep. Nancy Mace [R-SC]Rep. Nicole Malliotakis [R-NY]Rep. Tracey Mann [R-KS]Rep. Thomas Massie [R-KY]
Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL]Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA]Rep. David McKinley [R-WV]Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA]
Rep. Peter Meijer [R-MI]Rep. Mary Miller [R-IL]Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA]Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI]
Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV]Rep. Blake Moore [R-UT]Rep. Barry Moore [R-AL]Rep. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK]
Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC]Rep. Devin Nunes [R-CA]Rep. Jay Obernolte [R-CA]Rep. Burgess Owens [R-UT]
Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS]Rep. Gary Palmer [R-AL]Rep. Gregory Pence [R-IN]Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA]
Rep. August Pfluger [R-TX]Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL]Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA]Rep. Tom Rice [R-SC]
Rep. Harold Rogers [R-KY]Rep. John Rose [R-TN]Rep. Matt Rosendale [R-MT]Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC]
Rep. Chip Roy [R-TX]Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL]Rep. Steve Scalise [R-LA]Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA]
Rep. Jason Smith [R-MO]Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE]Rep. Lloyd Smucker [R-PA]Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN]
Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY]Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL]Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX]Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY]
Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA]Rep. Tom Tiffany [R-WI]Rep. William Timmons [R-SC]Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH]
Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI]Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ]Rep. Elizabeth Van Duyne [R-TX]Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI]
Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN]Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL]Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX]Rep. Daniel Webster [R-FL]
Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX]Rep. Mark Green [R-TN]Rep. Randy Feenstra [R-IA]Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX]
Rep. Jim Jordan [R-OH]Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ]Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR]Rep. Scott DesJarlais [R-TN]
Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX]Rep. David Valadao [R-CA]Rep. Trey Hollingsworth [R-IN]Rep. Michelle Fischbach [R-MN]
Rep. Steve Womack [R-AR]Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT]Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX]Rep. Julia Letlow [R-LA]
Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC]Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY]Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH]Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ]
Rep. Jerry Carl [R-AL]Rep. Andrew Garbarino [R-NY]Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN]Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ]
Rep. Troy Nehls [R-TX]Rep. Cliff Bentz [R-OR]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-28HouseMotion to Discharge Committee filed by Mr. Duncan. Petition No: 117-10. (Discharge petition text with signatures.)
2021-12-09HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-12-09HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-12-09HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SJR32 (Same As) 2022-03-02 - Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 49 - 44. Record Vote Number: 67. (text: CR S936)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback