US HJR59 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 66-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Environmental Protection Agency relating to "Accidental Release Prevention Requirements: Risk Management Programs under the Clean Air Act". This joint resolution nullifies the Environmental Protection Agency's rule entitled, "Accidental Release Prevention Requirements: Risk Management Programs under the Clean Air Act." The rule addresses safety at facilities that use and distribute hazardous chemicals. It was published on January 13, 2017.
Title
Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Environmental Protection Agency relating to "Accidental Release Prevention Requirements: Risk Management Programs under the Clean Air Act".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment. |
2017-02-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-02-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SJR28 (Related) 2017-03-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
Accidents
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Air quality
Congressional oversight
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Environmental technology
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Industrial facilities
Manufacturing
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Air quality
Congressional oversight
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Environmental technology
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Industrial facilities
Manufacturing
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-joint-resolution/59/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hjres59/BILLS-115hjres59ih.pdf |