US HJR50 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 30-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection relating to "Small Business Lending Under the Equal Credit Opportunity Act (Regulation B)".
Title
Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection relating to "Small Business Lending Under the Equal Credit Opportunity Act (Regulation B)".
Sponsors
Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX] | Rep. Andrew Ogles [R-TN] | Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] | Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA] |
Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] | Rep. French Hill [R-AR] | Rep. Scott Fitzgerald [R-WI] | Rep. Warren Davidson [R-OH] |
Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Brad Finstad [R-MN] | Rep. Trent Kelly [R-MS] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] |
Rep. Mike Ezell [R-MS] | Rep. Michael Guest [R-MS] | Rep. Ronny Jackson [R-TX] | Rep. Byron Donalds [R-FL] |
Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Monica De La Cruz [R-TX] | Rep. David Kustoff [R-TN] | Rep. Kelly Armstrong [R-ND] |
Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD] | Rep. Mike Johnson [R-LA] | Rep. Bryan Steil [R-WI] | Rep. Barry Moore [R-AL] |
Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Josh Brecheen [R-OK] | Rep. Mike Flood [R-NE] | Rep. Robert Good [R-VA] |
Rep. Harriet Hageman [R-WY] | Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2023-04-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HJR66 (Related) 2023-11-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 224.
SJR32 (Same As) 2024-01-10 - Failed of passage in Senate over veto by Yea-Nay Vote. 54 - 45. Record Vote Number: 5.
HJR85 (Same As) 2023-08-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
SJR32 (Same As) 2024-01-10 - Failed of passage in Senate over veto by Yea-Nay Vote. 54 - 45. Record Vote Number: 5.
HJR85 (Same As) 2023-08-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-joint-resolution/50/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hjres50/BILLS-118hjres50ih.pdf |