US HJR37 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 94-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This joint resolution directs the President to remove U.S. Armed Forces from hostilities in or affecting Yemen within 30 days unless Congress authorizes a later withdrawal date, issues a declaration of war, or specifically authorizes the use of the Armed Forces. Prohibited activities include providing in-flight fueling for non-U.S. aircraft conducting missions as part of the conflict in Yemen. This joint resolution shall not affect any military operations directed at Al Qaeda. The President must submit to Congress, within 90 days, reports assessing the risks that would be posed (1) if the United States were to cease supporting operations with respect to the conflict in Yemen, and (2) if Saudi Arabia were to cease sharing Yemen-related intelligence with the United States.
Title
Directing the removal of United States Armed Forces from hostilities in the Republic of Yemen that have not been authorized by Congress.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - On passage RC# 83 (Y: 248 N: 177 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - On motion to recommit with instructions RC# 82 (Y: 424 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - On agreeing to the Buck amendment (A001) H.Amdt.41 RC# 81 (Y: 252 N: 177 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - On motion to recommit with instructions RC# 82 (Y: 424 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - On agreeing to the Buck amendment (A001) H.Amdt.41 RC# 81 (Y: 252 N: 177 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2019-02-13 | House | The Clerk was authorized to correct section numbers, punctuation, and cross references, and to make other necessary technical and conforming corrections in the engrossment of H.J. Res. 37. |
2019-02-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-02-13 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 248 - 177, 1 Present (Roll no. 83). |
2019-02-13 | House | H.Amdt.42 On agreeing to the Engel amendment (A002) Agreed to by voice vote. |
2019-02-13 | House | H.Amdt.42 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Engel. (consideration: CR H1552-1554; text: CR H1552) |
2019-02-13 | House | On motion to recommit with instructions Agreed to by recorded vote: 424 - 0, 2 Present (Roll no. 82). |
2019-02-13 | House | The previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection. |
2019-02-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Kustoff (TN) motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to state that it is in the national security interest of the United States to combat anti-Semitism around the world. |
2019-02-13 | House | Mr. Kustoff (TN) moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Foreign Affairs. (text: CR H1554) |
2019-02-13 | House | The House adopted the amendment in the nature of a substitute as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union. |
2019-02-13 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2019-02-13 | House | The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.J. Res. 37. |
2019-02-13 | House | H.Amdt.41 On agreeing to the Buck amendment (A001) Agreed to by recorded vote: 252 - 177 (Roll no. 81). |
2019-02-13 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 122, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Buck amendment No. 2 |
2019-02-13 | House | H.Amdt.41 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Buck. |
2019-02-13 | House | GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.J. Res. 37. |
2019-02-13 | House | The Speaker designated the Honorable Stacey E. Plaskett to act as Chairwoman of the Committee. |
2019-02-13 | House | House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 122 and Rule XVIII. |
2019-02-13 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.J. Res. 37 with 1 hour of general debate. Motion to recommit with or without instructions allowed. A specified amendment is in order. The resolution provides through February 17, 2019, for the Speaker to entertain motions that the House suspend the rules. |
2019-02-13 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 122. (consideration: CR H1543-1556; text: CR H1552) |
2019-02-13 | House | Rule H. Res. 122 passed House. |
2019-02-11 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 122 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.J. Res. 37 with 1 hour of general debate. Motion to recommit with or without instructions allowed. A specified amendment is in order. The resolution provides through February 17, 2019, for the Speaker to entertain motions that the House suspend the rules. |
2019-02-08 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 2. |
2019-02-08 | House | Reported by the Committee on Foreign Affairs. H. Rept. 116-7. |
2019-02-06 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-02-06 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 25 - 17. |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2019-01-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SJR7 (Related) 2019-05-02 - Failed of passage in Senate over veto by Yea-Nay Vote. 53 - 45. Record Vote Number: 94.
HR122 (Related) 2019-02-13 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR274 (Related) 2019-04-02 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2968 (Related) 2019-05-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 59.
HB2740 (Related) 2019-10-31 - Motion by Senator McConnell to reconsider the vote by which the third cloture on the motion to proceed to H.R. 2740 was not invoked (Record Vote No. 342) entered in Senate.
HR122 (Related) 2019-02-13 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR274 (Related) 2019-04-02 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2968 (Related) 2019-05-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 59.
HB2740 (Related) 2019-10-31 - Motion by Senator McConnell to reconsider the vote by which the third cloture on the motion to proceed to H.R. 2740 was not invoked (Record Vote No. 342) entered in Senate.
Subjects
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Foreign aid and international relief
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
Israel
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military operations and strategy
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Saudi Arabia
Terrorism
War and emergency powers
Yemen
Congressional oversight
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Foreign aid and international relief
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
Israel
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military operations and strategy
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Saudi Arabia
Terrorism
War and emergency powers
Yemen