US HB2968 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 59.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Department of Defense Appropriations Act, 2020 This bill provides FY2020 appropriations to the Department of Defense (DOD) for military activities. The bill excludes military construction, military family housing, civil works projects of the Army Corps of Engineers, and nuclear warheads, which are all considered in other appropriations bills. Within the DOD budget, the bill provides appropriations for Military Personnel; Operation and Maintenance; Procurement; Research, Development, Test and Evaluation; and Revolving and Management Funds. The bill provides appropriations for Other Department of Defense Programs, including the Defense Health Program, Chemical Agents and Munitions Destruction, Drug Interdiction and Counter-Drug Activities, and the Office of the Inspector General. The bill provides appropriations for (1) Related Agencies, including the Central Intelligence Agency Retirement and Disability System Fund and the Intelligence Community Management Account; and (2) Overseas Contingency Operations/ Global War on Terrorism. The bill also includes provisions that repeal the 2001 Authorization for Use of Military Force after 240 days; prohibit funds from being used to construct a wall, fence, border barriers, or border security infrastructure along the southern land border of the United States; prohibit funds from being used to deliver F-35 air vehicles or other F-35 weapon system equipment to Turkey; and direct the President to remove the Armed Forces from hostilities in or affecting Yemen unless a declaration of war or specific authorization has been enacted, with certain exceptions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Defense Appropriations Act, 2020

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 59.
2019-05-23HouseThe House Committee on Appropriations reported an original measure, H. Rept. 116-84, by Mr. Visclosky.

Same As/Similar To

HJR37 (Related) 2019-02-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SJR7 (Related) 2019-05-02 - Failed of passage in Senate over veto by Yea-Nay Vote. 53 - 45. Record Vote Number: 94.
HB2740 (Related) 2019-10-31 - Motion by Senator McConnell to reconsider the vote by which the third cloture on the motion to proceed to H.R. 2740 was not invoked (Record Vote No. 342) entered in Senate.
SB2474 (Related) 2019-09-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 205.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback