US HJR131 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Federal Communications Commission relating to "Restoring Internet Freedom". This joint resolution nullifies the rule submitted by the Federal Communications Commission entitled "Restoring Internet Freedom." The rule published on February 22, 2018: (1) restores the classification of broadband Internet access service as a lightly-regulated "information service"; (2) reinstates private mobile service classification of mobile broadband Internet access service; (3) requires Internet service providers to disclose information about their network management practices, performance characteristics, and commercial terms of service; and (4) eliminates the Internet Conduct Standard and the bright-line rules.
Title
Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Federal Communications Commission relating to "Restoring Internet Freedom".
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2018-03-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2018-03-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HJR86 (Related) 2017-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
HJR129 (Same As) 2018-03-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
SJR34 (Related) 2017-04-03 - Became Public Law No: 115-22. (TXT | PDF)
SJR52 (Related) 2018-05-16 - Held at the desk.
HJR129 (Same As) 2018-03-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
SJR34 (Related) 2017-04-03 - Became Public Law No: 115-22. (TXT | PDF)
SJR52 (Related) 2018-05-16 - Held at the desk.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Internet and video services
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Internet and video services
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-joint-resolution/131/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hjres131/BILLS-115hjres131ih.pdf |