US SJR52 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-16 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-16 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A joint resolution providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Federal Communications Commission relating to "Restoring Internet Freedom". This joint resolution nullifies the rule submitted by the Federal Communications Commission entitled "Restoring Internet Freedom." The rule published on February 22, 2018: (1) restores the classification of broadband Internet access service as a lightly-regulated "information service"; (2) reinstates private mobile service classification of mobile broadband Internet access service; (3) requires Internet service providers to disclose information about their network management practices, performance characteristics, and commercial terms of service; and (4) eliminates the Internet Conduct Standard and the bright-line rules.
Title
A joint resolution providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Federal Communications Commission relating to "Restoring Internet Freedom".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-16 - Senate - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure RC# 96 (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Passed Senate without amendment RC# 97 (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Passed Senate without amendment RC# 97 (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | House | Held at the desk. |
2018-05-16 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-05-16 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 52 - 47. Record Vote Number: 97. (text: CR S2709) |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by motion. (consideration: CR S2698-2709) |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Motion to proceed to consideration of measure agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 52 - 47. Record Vote Number: 96. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S2698) |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-322. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 406. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by petition pursuant to 5 U.S.C. 802(c). |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HJR129 (Same As) 2018-03-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
HJR131 (Related) 2018-03-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
HJR131 (Related) 2018-03-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Internet and video services
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Internet and video services
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication