US HJR86 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Federal Communications Commission relating to "Protecting the Privacy of Customers of Broadband and Other Telecommunications Services". This joint resolution nullifies the rule submitted by the Federal Communications Commission entitled "Protecting the Privacy of Customers of Broadband and Other Telecommunications Services." The rule published on December 2, 2016: (1) applies the customer privacy requirements of the Communications Act of 1934 to broadband Internet access service and other telecommunications services, (2) requires telecommunications carriers to inform customers about rights to opt in or opt out of the use or the sharing of their confidential information, (3) adopts data security and breach notification requirements, (4) prohibits broadband service offerings that are contingent on surrendering privacy rights, and (5) requires disclosures and affirmative consent when a broadband provider offers customers financial incentives in exchange for the provider's right to use a customer's confidential information.
Title
Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Federal Communications Commission relating to "Protecting the Privacy of Customers of Broadband and Other Telecommunications Services".
Sponsors
Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX] | Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] | Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ] |
Rep. Steve Scalise [R-LA] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] |
Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Billy Long [R-MO] | Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN] | Rep. Mimi Walters [R-CA] |
Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY] | Rep. Ryan Costello [R-PA] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] |
Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2017-03-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-03-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SJR34 (Same As) 2017-04-03 - Became Public Law No: 115-22. (TXT | PDF)
HJR131 (Related) 2018-03-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
HJR131 (Related) 2018-03-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Internet and video services
Marketing and advertising
Right of privacy
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Internet and video services
Marketing and advertising
Right of privacy
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-joint-resolution/86/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hjres86/BILLS-115hjres86ih.pdf |