US HJR12 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 79-2)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

This joint resolution proposes a constitutional amendment limiting Representatives to three terms and Senators to two terms. Terms beginning before the ratification of this amendment do not count towards these term limits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States to limit the number of terms that a Member of Congress may serve.

Sponsors

Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC]Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL]Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL]Rep. Thomas Massie [R-KY]
Rep. John Joyce [R-PA]Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA]Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE]Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC]
Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA]Rep. Ted Budd [R-NC]Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ]Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY]
Rep. Lance Gooden [R-TX]Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL]Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ]Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ]
Rep. Warren Davidson [R-OH]Rep. Dan Bishop [R-NC]Rep. Greg Murphy [R-NC]Rep. Ronny Jackson [R-TX]
Rep. Kevin Hern [R-OK]Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL]Rep. Ron Wright [R-TX]Rep. Russ Fulcher [R-ID]
Rep. Byron Donalds [R-FL]Rep. Tim Burchett [R-TN]Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO]Rep. Barry Moore [R-AL]
Rep. Fred Keller [R-PA]Rep. Kat Cammack [R-FL]Rep. Diana Harshbarger [R-TN]Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC]
Rep. Marjorie Greene [R-GA]Rep. Yvette Herrell [R-NM]Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA]Rep. Robert Good [R-VA]
Rep. Nancy Mace [R-SC]Rep. Tom Tiffany [R-WI]Rep. Jacob Laturner [R-KS]Rep. Scott Franklin [R-FL]
Rep. Matt Rosendale [R-MT]Rep. Mike Johnson [R-LA]Rep. Tracey Mann [R-KS]Rep. Andrew Garbarino [R-NY]
Rep. Ken Buck [R-CO]Rep. Lauren Boebert [R-CO]Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK]Rep. Chip Roy [R-TX]
Rep. Trey Hollingsworth [R-IN]Rep. Christopher Jacobs [R-NY]Rep. James Comer [R-KY]Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL]
Rep. Michelle Fischbach [R-MN]Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA]Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX]Rep. Blake Moore [R-UT]
Rep. Randy Feenstra [R-IA]Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY]Rep. Michael Cloud [R-TX]Rep. Victoria Spartz [R-IN]
Rep. Nicole Malliotakis [R-NY]Rep. Stephanie Bice [R-OK]Rep. Jody Arrington [R-TX]Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME]
Rep. Mark Green [R-TN]Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH]Rep. David Cawthorn [R-NC]Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV]
Rep. Mary Miller [R-IL]Rep. Drew Ferguson [R-GA]Rep. Burgess Owens [R-UT]Rep. Julia Letlow [R-LA]
Rep. Gary Palmer [R-AL]Rep. Ernest Gonzales [R-TX]Rep. William Timmons [R-SC]Rep. Jake Ellzey [R-TX]
Rep. Tom Rice [R-SC]Rep. Cliff Bentz [R-OR]Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL]Rep. Troy Nehls [R-TX]
Rep. Mike Carey [D-OH]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-04HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
2021-01-04HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2021-01-04HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SJR3 (Same As) 2021-01-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HJR18 (Related) 2021-03-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SJR2 (Related) 2021-01-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HJR71 (Related) 2022-02-08 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
HJR69 (Related) 2022-02-01 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
SJR27 (Related) 2021-10-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback