US SJR2 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A joint resolution proposing amendments to the Constitution of the United States relative to the line item veto, a limitation on the number of terms that a Member of Congress may serve, and requiring a vote of two-thirds of the membership of both Houses of Congress on any legislation raising or imposing new taxes or fees.
Title
A joint resolution proposing amendments to the Constitution of the United States relative to the line item veto, a limitation on the number of terms that a Member of Congress may serve, and requiring a vote of two-thirds of the membership of both Houses of Congress on any legislation raising or imposing new taxes or fees.
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SJR3 (Related) 2021-01-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HJR12 (Related) 2021-03-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HJR18 (Related) 2021-03-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HJR71 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SJR27 (Related) 2021-10-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HJR12 (Related) 2021-03-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HJR18 (Related) 2021-03-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HJR71 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SJR27 (Related) 2021-10-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-joint-resolution/2/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/sjres2/BILLS-117sjres2is.pdf |