US SJR3 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States relative to limiting the number of terms that a Member of Congress may serve.
Title
A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States relative to limiting the number of terms that a Member of Congress may serve.
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] |
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] | Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] | Sen. Ben Sasse [R-NE] |
Sen. Tommy Tuberville [R-AL] | Sen. Roger Marshall [R-KS] | Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] |
Sen. Rand Paul [R-KY] | Sen. Josh Hawley [R-MO] | Sen. Bill Hagerty [R-TN] | Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HJR12 (Same As) 2021-03-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HJR18 (Related) 2021-03-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SJR2 (Related) 2021-01-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HJR71 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HJR69 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SJR27 (Related) 2021-10-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HJR18 (Related) 2021-03-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SJR2 (Related) 2021-01-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HJR71 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HJR69 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SJR27 (Related) 2021-10-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-joint-resolution/3/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/sjres3/BILLS-117sjres3is.pdf |