US HCR70 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 108-7)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Condemning threats of violence against historically Black colleges and universities (HBCUs) and reaffirming support for HBCUs and their students.
Title
Condemning threats of violence against historically Black colleges and universities (HBCUs) and reaffirming support for HBCUs and their students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended (Y: 418 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2022-03-08 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-03-08 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 418 - 0 (Roll no. 61). (text: CR H1346) |
2022-03-08 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1356-1357) |
2022-03-08 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-03-08 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 70. |
2022-03-08 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1346-1352) |
2022-03-08 | House | Mr. Scott (VA) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
2022-02-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR534 (Related) 2022-03-03 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S998, text: CR S995-996)