US HB984 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to authorize the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to award grants to States to improve outreach to veterans, and for other purposes.
Title
Commitment to Veteran Support and Outreach Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2023-07-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-04-19 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2023-04-19 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-03-29 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2023-03-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2023-02-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2023-02-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB106 (Related) 2023-11-17 - Held at the desk.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/984/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr984/BILLS-118hr984ih.pdf |