US HB962 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 185-5)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Born-Alive Abortion Survivors Protection Act This bill establishes requirements for the degree of care a health care practitioner must exercise in the event a child is born alive following an abortion or attempted abortion. A health care practitioner who is present must (1) exercise the same degree of care as reasonably provided to another child born alive at the same gestational age, and (2) immediately admit the child to a hospital. The bill also requires a health care practitioner or other employee to immediately report any failure to comply with this requirement to law enforcement. A person who violates the requirements is subject to criminal penalties—a fine, up to five years in prison, or both. Additionally, an individual who intentionally kills or attempts to kill a child born alive is subject to prosecution for murder. The bill bars the criminal prosecution of a mother of a child born alive for conspiracy to violate these provisions, for being an accessory after the fact, or for concealment of felony. A woman who undergoes an abortion or attempted abortion may file a civil action for damages against an individual who violates this bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Born-Alive Abortion Survivors Protection Act

Sponsors

Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO]Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX]Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE]Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN]
Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL]Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY]Rep. Doug Collins [R-GA]Rep. Warren Davidson [R-OH]
Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC]Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN]Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH]Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ]
Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI]Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH]Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA]Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO]
Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV]Rep. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK]Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC]Rep. David Roe [R-TN]
Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT]Rep. Mark Walker [R-NC]Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN]Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX]
Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA]Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH]Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA]Rep. Mark Green [R-TN]
Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT]Rep. Chip Roy [R-TX]Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY]Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI]
Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY]Rep. Mike Johnson [R-LA]Rep. John Joyce [R-PA]Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH]
Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC]Rep. Ralph Abraham [R-LA]Rep. Roger Marshall [R-KS]Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN]
Rep. Drew Ferguson [R-GA]Rep. Lloyd Smucker [R-PA]Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA]Rep. Andy Harris [R-MD]
Rep. Steve Scalise [R-LA]Rep. Kevin McCarthy [R-CA]Rep. Jim Jordan [R-OH]Rep. John Ratcliffe [R-TX]
Rep. William Timmons [R-SC]Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD]Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN]Rep. Kevin Hern [R-OK]
Rep. Jody Arrington [R-TX]Rep. Jason Smith [R-MO]Rep. Michael Conaway [R-TX]Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX]
Rep. David Kustoff [R-TN]Rep. James Hagedorn [R-MN]Rep. Kelly Armstrong [R-ND]Rep. Tim Burchett [R-TN]
Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA]Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC]Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX]Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO]
Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC]Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX]Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY]Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO]
Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX]Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL]Rep. Mike D. Rogers [R-AL]Rep. Tom Rice [R-SC]
Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA]Rep. Ted Budd [R-NC]Rep. Gregory Pence [R-IN]Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL]
Rep. Kay Granger [R-TX]Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA]Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR]Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL]
Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI]Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH]Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX]Rep. Ron Estes [R-KS]
Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA]Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA]Rep. Bryan Steil [R-WI]Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ]
Rep. Robert Aderholt [R-AL]Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA]Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA]Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH]
Rep. Steve Watkins [R-KS]Rep. David Joyce [R-OH]Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL]Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH]
Rep. John Rose [R-TN]Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ]Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA]Rep. Daniel Webster [R-FL]
Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI]Rep. Russ Fulcher [R-ID]Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI]Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX]
Rep. Barry Loudermilk [R-GA]Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL]Rep. Michael Guest [R-MS]Rep. John Curtis [R-UT]
Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL]Rep. Paul Mitchell [R-MI]Rep. Denver Riggleman [R-VA]Rep. Debbie Lesko [D-AZ]
Rep. Sean Duffy [R-WI]Rep. Carol Miller [R-WV]Rep. Ken Buck [R-CO]Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX]
Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL]Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC]Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX]Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX]
Rep. Ron Wright [R-TX]Rep. James Baird [R-IN]Rep. John Carter [R-TX]Rep. George Holding [R-NC]
Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS]Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA]Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY]Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA]
Rep. Martha Roby [R-AL]Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA]Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA]Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX]
Rep. Harold Rogers [R-KY]Rep. Michael Cloud [R-TX]Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT]Rep. Lance Gooden [R-TX]
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR]Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI]Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ]Rep. French Hill [R-AR]
Rep. Billy Long [R-MO]Rep. David McKinley [R-WV]Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN]Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA]
Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO]Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK]Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL]Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX]
Rep. Patrick McHenry [R-NC]Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE]Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL]Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC]
Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE]Rep. James Comer [R-KY]Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI]Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA]
Rep. Trent Kelly [R-MS]Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL]Rep. Michael Simpson [R-ID]Rep. Steve Womack [R-AR]
Rep. Ross Spano [R-FL]Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL]Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL]Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL]
Rep. Gary Palmer [R-AL]Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL]Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN]Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX]
Rep. Duncan Hunter [R-CA]Rep. Ben Cline [R-VA]Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL]Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV]
Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY]Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL]Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH]Rep. Tom Graves [R-GA]
Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL]Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH]Rep. Steve King [R-IA]Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN]
Rep. Mac Thornberry [R-TX]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO]Rep. Trey Hollingsworth [R-IN]
Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL]Rep. Rob Woodall [R-GA]Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL]Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR]
Rep. Amata Radewagen [D-AS]Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
2019-02-06HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1367)
2019-02-05HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2019-02-05HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB130 (Related) 2019-01-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB311 (Related) 2019-02-25 - Cloture on the motion to proceed not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 53 - 44. Record Vote Number: 27. (CR S1422)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback