US SB311 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 51-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 56 - 41. Record Vote Number: 58. (CR S1136)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 56 - 41. Record Vote Number: 58. (CR S1136)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes requirements for the degree of care a health care practitioner must exercise in the event a child is born alive following an abortion or attempted abortion. A health care practitioner who is present must (1) exercise the same degree of care as reasonably provided to another child born alive at the same gestational age, and (2) immediately admit the child to a hospital. The bill also requires a health care practitioner or other employee to immediately report any failure to comply with this requirement to law enforcement. A person who violates the requirements is subject to criminal penalties—a fine, up to five years in prison, or both. Additionally, an individual who intentionally kills or attempts to kill a child born alive is subject to prosecution for murder. The bill bars the criminal prosecution of a mother of a child born alive for conspiracy to violate these provisions, for being an accessory after the fact, or for concealment of felony. A woman who undergoes an abortion or attempted abortion may file a civil action for damages against an individual who violates this bill.
Title
Born-Alive Abortion Survivors Protection Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure RC# 58 (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Cloture on the motion to proceed RC# 27 (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Cloture on the motion to proceed RC# 27 (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Senate | Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 56 - 41. Record Vote Number: 58. (CR S1136) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Motion to proceed to consideration of measure withdrawn in Senate. (CR S1062) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure presented in Senate. (CR S1062) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S1062) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Cloture on the motion to proceed not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 53 - 44. Record Vote Number: 27. (CR S1422) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (CR S1414) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the consideration of measure presented in Senate. (CR S1364) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S1364) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 17. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
Same As/Similar To
SB130 (Related) 2020-02-11 - Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
HB962 (Related) 2019-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB8923 (Related) 2020-12-09 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
HB962 (Related) 2019-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB8923 (Related) 2020-12-09 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Abortion
Civil actions and liability
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Health personnel
Legal fees and court costs
Medical ethics
Violent crime
Civil actions and liability
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Health personnel
Legal fees and court costs
Medical ethics
Violent crime