US HB918 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-08 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-08 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Veteran Urgent Access to Mental Healthcare Act (Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to furnish to former members of the Armed Forces: (1) an initial mental health assessment; and (2) the mental health care services required to treat the member's urgent mental health care needs, including risk of suicide or harming others. A former member of the Armed Forces is an individual who: served in the active military, naval, or air service, was discharged or released under a condition less than honorable (except a dishonorable or bad conduct discharge), has applied for a character of service determination that has not yet been made, and is not otherwise eligible to enroll in the VA health care system by reason of such discharge or release; or while serving in the Armed Forces, was deployed in a theater of combat operations or an area at a time during which hostilities occurred in that area, participated in or experienced such combat operations or hostilities (including by controlling an unmanned aerial vehicle from a location other than such theater or area), or was the victim of a physical assault of a sexual nature, battery of a sexual nature, or sexual harassment. The VA may provide such mental health care services at a non-VA facility if: (1) the receipt of mental health care services by an individual in VA facilities would be clinically inadvisable, or (2) VA facilities are not capable of furnishing such mental health care services to that individual economically because of geographical inaccessibility. The VA shall: (1) seek to ensure that such mental health care services are furnished in a therapeutically appropriate setting, and (2) provide referral services to assist former members who are not eligible for such VA services in obtaining services from non-VA sources. (Sec. 3) The VA shall establish a process by which an individual who was discharged from the Armed Forces can seek a VA determination as to whether the discharge was under a condition barring the individual from receiving a VA benefit. If the VA determines that the individual is so barred, the VA shall provide such individual with information regarding his or her ability to address such condition.
Title
Veteran Urgent Access to Mental Healthcare Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2017-11-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-11-07 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8550) |
2017-11-07 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 918. |
2017-11-07 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8550-8553) |
2017-11-07 | House | Mr. Bilirakis moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-11-06 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 287. |
2017-11-06 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-390. |
2017-07-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-07-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-04-06 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2017-03-29 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2017-03-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-02-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2017-02-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2548 (Related) 2018-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Assault and harassment offenses
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Crime victims
Crimes against women
Government studies and investigations
Health care coverage and access
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mental health
Military operations and strategy
National Guard and reserves
Sex offenses
Veterans' medical care
Assault and harassment offenses
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Crime victims
Crimes against women
Government studies and investigations
Health care coverage and access
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mental health
Military operations and strategy
National Guard and reserves
Sex offenses
Veterans' medical care