US HB9178 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Controlled Substances Act to fix a technical error in the definitions.
Title
To amend the Controlled Substances Act to fix a technical error in the definitions.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Burchett [R-TN] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2022-10-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2022-10-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB445 (Related) 2021-02-25 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB4235 (Same As) 2022-09-15 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
SB4235 (Same As) 2022-09-15 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/9178/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr9178/BILLS-117hr9178ih.pdf |