US SB4235 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-15 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-15 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Controlled Substances Act to fix a technical error in the definitions.
Title
A bill to amend the Controlled Substances Act to fix a technical error in the definitions.
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-15 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-09-15 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-09-15 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-09-14 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4624-4625; text: CR S4625) |
2022-09-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SB445 (Related) 2021-02-25 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB9178 (Same As) 2022-10-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB9178 (Same As) 2022-10-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.