US HB8987 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-15 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 547.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-15 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 547.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Justice for United States Victims of State Sponsored Terrorism Act to authorize appropriations for catch-up payments from the United States Victims of State Sponsored Terrorism Fund.
Title
Fairness for 9/11 Families Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] |
Roll Calls
2022-09-30 - House - On passage (Y: 400 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-15 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 547. |
2022-11-14 | Senate | Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
2022-10-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2022-09-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-09-30 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 400 - 31 (Roll no. 477). (text: CR H8351) |
2022-09-30 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8355-8356) |
2022-09-30 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 8987, the Chair put the question on passage of the bill and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Biggs demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced. |
2022-09-30 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2022-09-30 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 8987. |
2022-09-30 | House | Resolution provides for the consideration of the Senate amendment to H. R. 6833 and H.R. 8987, and an hour of debate for each measure. It also provides for a motion to recommit H.R. 6833. |
2022-09-30 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1404. (consideration: CR H8351-8354) |
2022-09-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2022-09-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB8648 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB8667 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HR1404 (Related) 2022-09-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB5045 (Same As) 2022-09-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB5156 (Related) 2022-11-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB8667 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HR1404 (Related) 2022-09-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB5045 (Same As) 2022-09-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB5156 (Related) 2022-11-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.