US HB8801 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-04 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H6818)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-04 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H6818)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the service of Air America employees as qualifying service for purposes of the Civil Service Retirement System. (Air America was a government-owned airline that provided air transport for certain covert operations in Southeast Asia, including Laos and Vietnam, between 1950 and 1976.) The bill applies to U.S. citizens who were employees of Air America or another affiliated company, as specified, between January 1, 1950 and December 31, 1976. Benefit applications must be filed within two years of the date of enactment of this bill.
Title
Air America Act of 2020
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H6818) |
2020-11-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2020-11-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4380 (Same As) 2020-07-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
Aviation and airports
Central Intelligence Agency (CIA)
Government corporations and government-sponsored enterprises
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Transportation employees
Central Intelligence Agency (CIA)
Government corporations and government-sponsored enterprises
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Transportation employees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/8801/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr8801/BILLS-116hr8801ih.pdf |