US HB8630 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on July 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-17 - Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 16.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-17 - Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 16.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 400 North Main Street in Belen, New Mexico, as the "U.S. Senator Dennis Chávez Post Office".
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 400 North Main Street in Belen, New Mexico, as the "U.S. Senator Dennis Chávez Post Office".
Sponsors
Rep. Melanie Stansbury [D-NM] | Rep. Teresa Fernandez [D-NM] | Rep. Yvette Herrell [R-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 16. |
2022-11-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-09-20 | House | Request to order reported by unanimous consent failed. |
2022-09-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-07-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2022-07-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4668 (Same As) 2022-09-28 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 519.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/8630/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr8630/BILLS-117hr8630ih.pdf |