US HB860 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 210-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Social Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Social Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases various Old Age, Survivors, and Disability Insurance (OASDI) benefits and related taxes. The bill increases the primary insurance amount (e.g., the amount a Social Security beneficiary receives if the beneficiary begins receiving benefits at normal retirement age) by increasing the percentage of the beneficiary's average indexed monthly earnings used to calculate the amount. The Bureau of Labor Statistics shall publish a Consumer Price Index for Elderly Consumers, which the Social Security Administration (SSA) shall use to calculate cost-of-living adjustments to benefits. Currently, the SSA uses a price index for wage earners to make such adjustments. The bill increases the minimum benefit amount for individuals who worked for more than 10 years by creating an alternative minimum benefit. A qualifying beneficiary shall receive that alternative minimum if it is higher than the standard calculated benefit amount. The bill increases the income threshold that a beneficiary must reach before Social Security benefits are taxable. Increased benefits from this bill shall not count as income when determining an individual's eligibility or benefit amounts for (1) Medicaid, (2) the Children's Health Insurance Program, or (3) the Supplemental Security Income program. Income above $400,000 shall be included when calculating Social Security benefits and taxes. The bill also increases rates for the payroll and self-employment taxes that fund OASDI. The bill establishes the Social Security Trust Fund, which replaces the Federal Old-Age and Survivors Insurance Trust Fund and the Federal Disability Insurance Trust Fund.
Title
Social Security 2100 Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security. |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB269 (Same As) 2019-01-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB478 (Related) 2019-02-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1170 (Related) 2019-02-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
SB1950 (Related) 2019-06-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB478 (Related) 2019-02-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1170 (Related) 2019-02-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
SB1950 (Related) 2019-06-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Aging
Disability assistance
Employment taxes
Government trust funds
Inflation and prices
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Self-employed
Social security and elderly assistance
Social welfare
Wages and earnings
Disability assistance
Employment taxes
Government trust funds
Inflation and prices
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Self-employed
Social security and elderly assistance
Social welfare
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/860/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr860/BILLS-116hr860ih.pdf |