US SB478 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to enhance Social Security benefits and ensure the long-term solvency of the Social Security program.
Title
Social Security Expansion Act
Sponsors
Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] |
Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB860 (Related) 2019-01-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
SB269 (Related) 2019-01-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1170 (Related) 2019-02-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
SB1950 (Related) 2019-06-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB269 (Related) 2019-01-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1170 (Related) 2019-02-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
SB1950 (Related) 2019-06-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Congressional oversight
Disability assistance
Elementary and secondary education
Employment taxes
Financial services and investments
Government trust funds
Higher education
Income tax rates
Inflation and prices
Railroads
Self-employed
Social security and elderly assistance
Social welfare
Transportation employees
Congressional oversight
Disability assistance
Elementary and secondary education
Employment taxes
Financial services and investments
Government trust funds
Higher education
Income tax rates
Inflation and prices
Railroads
Self-employed
Social security and elderly assistance
Social welfare
Transportation employees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/478/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s478/BILLS-116s478is.pdf |