US HB8472 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-04 - Became Public Law No: 116-211. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-04 - Became Public Law No: 116-211. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises the Impact Aid Program application process for FY2022. It also revises FY2021 allocations under the Migrant Education Program. First, the bill requires local educational agencies (LEAs) participating in the Impact Aid Program to use the student count or federal property valuation data from their FY2021 program applications, as applicable, for their FY2022 program applications. The program provides funding to LEAs that have lost property tax revenue due to the presence of tax-exempt federal property or to those that have experienced increased expenditures due to enrollment of federally connected children (e.g., children living on Indian lands or military bases). In addition, the bill directs the Department of Education to use school year 2018-2019 data or school year 2019-2020 data, whichever is greater, for making FY2021 allocations to states under the Migrant Education Program. States use these program funds to identify eligible migratory children and provide them with education and support services.
Title
Impact Aid Coronavirus Relief Act
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] | Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD] | Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-211. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-12-04 | House | Signed by President. |
2020-11-24 | House | Presented to President. |
2020-11-12 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-11-12 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6660) |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2020-10-02 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-10-02 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H5660) |
2020-10-02 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H5659-5660) |
2020-10-02 | House | Committee on Education and Labor discharged. |
2020-10-02 | House | Mr. Scott (VA) asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2020-10-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
2020-10-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB925 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB8406 (Related) 2020-09-29 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB8075 (Related) 2020-08-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SB4063 (Related) 2020-06-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S3209)
SB4800 (Related) 2020-11-09 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 581.
HB8406 (Related) 2020-09-29 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB8075 (Related) 2020-08-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SB4063 (Related) 2020-06-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S3209)
SB4800 (Related) 2020-11-09 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 581.
Subjects
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Education
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government information and archives
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Migrant, seasonal, agricultural labor
Property tax
State and local taxation
Education
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government information and archives
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Migrant, seasonal, agricultural labor
Property tax
State and local taxation