US SB4063 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S3209)
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S3209)
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows local educational agencies (LEAs) participating in the Impact Aid Program to use the student count and federal property valuation data from their FY2021 program applications for their FY2022 program applications. The program provides funding to LEAs that have lost property tax revenue due to the presence of tax-exempt federal property or to those that have experienced increased expenditures due to enrollment of federally connected children (e.g., children living on Indian lands or military bases).
Title
Impact Aid Coronavirus Relief Act
Sponsors
Sen. John Thune [R-SD] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S3209) |
Same As/Similar To
SB4322 (Related) 2020-07-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB8075 (Same As) 2020-08-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB8472 (Related) 2020-12-04 - Became Public Law No: 116-211. (TXT | PDF)
HB8075 (Same As) 2020-08-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB8472 (Related) 2020-12-04 - Became Public Law No: 116-211. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Education
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Government information and archives
Property tax
State and local taxation
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Government information and archives
Property tax
State and local taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/4063/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s4063/BILLS-116s4063is.pdf |