US HB8087 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-22 - Referred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, the Budget, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-22 - Referred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, the Budget, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Small Business Act and the CARES Act to establish a program for second draw loans and make other modifications to the paycheck protection program, and for other purposes.
Title
To amend the Small Business Act and the CARES Act to establish a program for second draw loans and make other modifications to the paycheck protection program, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, the Budget, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-08-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, the Budget, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-08-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, the Budget, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-08-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, the Budget, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-08-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4321 (Related) 2020-07-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
HB8265 (Related) 2020-09-16 - Referred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB4775 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 564.
SB4773 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 562.
HB8265 (Related) 2020-09-16 - Referred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB4775 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 564.
SB4773 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 562.
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Agricultural prices, subsidies, credit
Appropriations
Bankruptcy
Business ethics
Business expenses
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Commerce
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Corporate finance and management
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Farm Credit Administration
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Life, casualty, property insurance
Public participation and lobbying
Religion
Small business
Small Business Administration
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Tax-exempt organizations
Temporary and part-time employment
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Wages and earnings
Worker safety and health
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Agricultural prices, subsidies, credit
Appropriations
Bankruptcy
Business ethics
Business expenses
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Commerce
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Corporate finance and management
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Farm Credit Administration
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Life, casualty, property insurance
Public participation and lobbying
Religion
Small business
Small Business Administration
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Tax-exempt organizations
Temporary and part-time employment
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Wages and earnings
Worker safety and health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/8087/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr8087/BILLS-116hr8087ih.pdf |