US HB7993 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on August 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-07 - Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-07 - Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises requirements applicable to Community Development Financial Institutions (CDFIs) and Minority Depository Institutions (MDIs) and addresses lending during the COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) pandemic. The bill establishes mandatory set-asides for (1) minority CDFIs under the CDFI Fund, and (2) CDFIs and MDIs under existing COVID-19 economic aid programs. The bill also establishes an impact bank designation for certain small depository institutions that lend primarily to low-income borrowers and establishes programs for impact banks and MDIs regarding investments, technical assistance, and federal government deposits. Finally, the Department of the Treasury must provide capital and interest-free loans to CDFIs, MDIs, impact banks, and credit unions that primarily serve low-income, underserved communities. The bill also reduces the CDFI Bond Guarantee Program minimum issuance amount from $100 million to $25 million for FY2020 and to $50 million for fiscal years thereafter.
Title
Promoting and Advancing Communities of Color through Inclusive Lending Act
Sponsors
Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA] | Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] | Rep. Al Green [D-TX] | Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] |
Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL] | Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA] | Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] | Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] |
Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] | Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] |
Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL] | Rep. David Scott [D-GA] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] |
Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] | Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] | Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-08-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-08-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6868 (Related) 2020-05-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB5315 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB6830 (Related) 2020-05-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
SB3774 (Related) 2020-05-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB5315 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB6830 (Related) 2020-05-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
SB3774 (Related) 2020-05-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Business investment and capital
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Community Development Financial Institutions Fund
Community life and organization
Congressional oversight
Department of the Treasury
Economic development
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (FDIC)
Federal Reserve System
Finance and financial sector
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Housing and community development funding
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
National Credit Union Administration
Poverty and welfare assistance
Securities
Small business
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Business investment and capital
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Community Development Financial Institutions Fund
Community life and organization
Congressional oversight
Department of the Treasury
Economic development
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (FDIC)
Federal Reserve System
Finance and financial sector
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Housing and community development funding
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
National Credit Union Administration
Poverty and welfare assistance
Securities
Small business
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7993/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7993/BILLS-116hr7993ih.pdf |