US HB5315 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding Opportunity for MDIs Act Expanding Opportunity for Minority Depository Institutions Act This bill establishes the Financial Agent Mentor-Protégé Program within the Department of the Treasury. The program provides participating minority deposit institutions with mentorship regarding becoming a financial agent for Treasury.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expanding Opportunity for MDIs Act Expanding Opportunity for Minority Depository Institutions Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-14SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
2020-01-13HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-01-13HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H192)
2020-01-13HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5315.
2020-01-13HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H192-194)
2020-01-13HouseMs. Waters moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-12-11HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 57 - 0.
2019-12-11HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-12-10HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-12-05HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
2019-12-05HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback