US HB7938 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - Subcommittee Hearings Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - Subcommittee Hearings Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Klamath Basin Water Supply Enhancement Act of 2000 to provide the Secretary of the Interior with certain authorities with respect to projects affecting the Klamath Basin watershed, and for other purposes.
Title
Klamath Basin Water Agreement Support Act of 2024
Sponsors
Rep. Cliff Bentz [R-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-22 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2024-05-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Wildlife, and Fisheries. |
2024-04-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2024-04-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB482 (Related) 2023-07-19 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/7938/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr7938/BILLS-118hr7938ih.pdf |