US HB7925 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-11)
Status: Passed on December 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 117-238.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-11)
Status: Passed on December 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 117-238.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the outpatient clinic of the Department of Veterans Affairs in Palm Desert, California, as the "Sy Kaplan Veterans Center".
Title
To designate the Department of Veterans Affairs community-based outpatient clinic located in Palm Desert, California, as the "Sy Kaplan VA Clinic".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-20 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-238. |
2022-12-20 | House | Signed by President. |
2022-12-16 | House | Presented to President. |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-12-06 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7008) |
2022-12-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-11-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2022-11-14 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2022-11-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-11-14 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8455) |
2022-11-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7925. |
2022-11-14 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8455-8457) |
2022-11-14 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2022-06-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2022-05-31 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2022-05-31 | House | Introduced in House |