US HB7899 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Engrossed on November 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 75 Commerce Drive in Grayslake, Illinois, as the "Army Specialist Joseph 'Joey' W. Dimock II Post Office Building".
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 75 Commerce Drive in Grayslake, Illinois, as the "Army Specialist Joseph 'Joey' W. Dimock II Post Office Building".
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Marie Newman [D-IL] |
Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL] | Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] | Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL] | Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] |
Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] |
Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] |
Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL] | Rep. Mary Miller [R-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-11-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-11-14 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8485) |
2022-11-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7899. |
2022-11-14 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8485-8486) |
2022-11-14 | House | Mrs. Maloney, Carolyn B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-06-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-06-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-05-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2022-05-27 | House | Introduced in House |