US HB784 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 445.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 445.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require any person that maintains an internet website or that sells or distributes a mobile application that is owned, wholly or partially, by the Chinese Communist Party or by a non-state-owned entity located in the People's Republic of China, to disclose that fact to any individual who downloads or otherwise uses such website or application.
Title
Internet Application I.D. Act Internet Application Integrity and Disclosure Act
Sponsors
Rep. Russ Fulcher [R-ID] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA] | Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-04 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 445. |
2024-06-04 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 118-536. |
2023-03-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 28 - 22. |
2023-03-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-02-07 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2023-02-07 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-02-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Innovation, Data, and Commerce. |
2023-02-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2023-02-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB742 (Related) 2023-03-09 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 28 - 22.
SB3329 (Related) 2023-11-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB3329 (Related) 2023-11-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.